U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-01170
  • Case Name: Tara Boskoff Palmer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Final Report: Notice of Deposit of Unclaimed Funds]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Additional Fees]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [miscellaneous document]
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order (Generic)]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Application for Additional Fees]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Dismissing Case (Sua Sponte)]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Declaration]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Declaration]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [BNC Order Denying Confirmation of Ch 13 Plan [CHAMBERS ONLY]]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 188)]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.