U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUDLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 27, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.