U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00385-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEWIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.