U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MERRITTS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.