U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00209
  • Case Name: Partner One Acquisitions Inc. et al v. WhatFix Private Limited et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.