U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00977
  • Case Name: Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. et al v. Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint - Amended]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • February 21, 2025: [Claim Construction Chart]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.