U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-00306-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Re: Due Process (Brady Order)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.