U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Re: Due Process (Brady Order)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • March 26, 2025: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.