U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21187
  • Case Name: Nick Grigoriadis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Order of Final Decree]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Notice Re: Trustees Final Report and Final Account]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Discharging Debtor - auto docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.