U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01411
  • Case Name: Tate v. Macy's Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 14, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • November 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.