U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01409
  • Case Name: Manke v. Newington et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 02, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice]
  • November 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 07, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • November 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.