U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01402
  • Case Name: Green v. Papusa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order re: Insufficiency]
  • November 08, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.