U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santiago
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • February 03, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order of Transfer]
  • February 03, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 21, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 21, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 21, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.