U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Unseal Case]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Search Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sealed Search Warrant Issued]
  • January 19, 2022: [Application for Sealed Search Warrant]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
January, 2021
  • January 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 16, 2021: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 16, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 16, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 16, 2021: [Sealed Search Warrant Issued]
  • January 16, 2021: [Application for Sealed Search Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.