U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00289-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 04, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 11, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 23, 2020: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2020: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 21, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 18, 2020: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 18, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Continue ]
  • January 10, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 23, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 23, 2019: [Continue ]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 27, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 27, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 26, 2018: [Continue ]
  • November 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Suppress]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2018: [Order]
  • March 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 28, 2018: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 05, 2018: [Continue ]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 08, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • December 21, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.