U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Writ Returned]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Writ Returned]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Writ Returned]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Writ Issued]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 18, 2018: [Seal]
  • September 18, 2018: [Application for Writ]
  • September 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 22, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.