U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 10, 2025: [Reconsideration]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 08, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.