U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spruill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • October 17, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 15, 2022: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2022: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2022: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • May 19, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 21, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.