U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00068
  • Case Name: Howmedica Osteonics Corp. v. Schilling
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 13, 2022: [Reopen Case]
  • May 13, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.