U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 16, 2022: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 16, 2022: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2022: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.