U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lesh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court-cr cases]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Supplement]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court-cr cases]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • August 15, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Supplement]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.