U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00315-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Livermore et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 18, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • December 21, 2021: [Leave to Restrict]
  • December 21, 2021: [Dismiss Counts]
  • December 21, 2021: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 14, 2021: [Supplement]
  • December 12, 2021: [Departure]
  • December 12, 2021: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 27, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 25, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Clarification]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Non-Guideline Sentence]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 16, 2021: [Dismiss Counts]
  • June 16, 2021: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for James Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 20, 2020: [James Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Hearing]
  • October 13, 2020: [Bond]
  • October 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.