U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trujillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.