U.S. Federal Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-bk-11049-TA
  • Case Name: Sunstone Development, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Process Paid Request for Certified Copy]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Request for a Certified Copy]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 or Chapter 9: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insi]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.