U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01582-CL7
  • Case Name: Jazzle Marie Jackson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Notice of Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installment]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [BNC Court Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (Ch7)(122A-1Supp)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Amendment (CSD 1100)(fee)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Notice Regarding Interpreters]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Errors/Deficiencies (BNC)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Photo Identification for Persons Filing a Petition without Attorney (secured image)(BNC)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Application) (CSD 1006)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order) LBR 1006-4 (paperless entry)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Statement About Your Social Security Number (121) (secured image)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing of Self-Represented Individuals (eSR) (CSD 1804)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Davis, Gerald H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(fee) internal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.