U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41818
  • Case Name: Dawn Deanna Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc Order Confirming Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Notice of Order Confirming Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (batch)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Hearing Held (Bk)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.