U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-03483
  • Case Name: Zayo Group, LLC v. CVIN, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Clerk's Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate/Proof of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Ex Parte Application]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2025: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Ex Parte Application]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.