U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01546-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez Ayala
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing (No PDF)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 03, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.