U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02806-
  • Case Name: LYNETTE RAE WACHTERHAUSER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Summary of Schedules]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Schedules]
  • April 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.