U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02807-
  • Case Name: CRYSTAL O. CHENG
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.