U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02808-PS
  • Case Name: FRANCISCO EMANUEL LOPEZ CRUZ and ANAYELLI VARGAS OVALLES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.