U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02804-
  • Case Name: ANTONIO CORRALES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.