U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-bk-01772-
  • Case Name: JIA-YEE LAI and JUDY RUEY-HOUNG LAI
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [UST Review of Chapter 7 Trustee Final Report (batch)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation (batch)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Final Report and Account (Chapter 7) (batch)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Trustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee (Application for)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oApprove Compromise/Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [No Objection (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.