U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02805
  • Case Name: John Derek Spendlove
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oReinstating Case]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.