U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00445
  • Case Name: Knudson et al v. Soul Surgery LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.