U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01973
  • Case Name: Davis #331794 v. Morelos et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Service Packet Forwarded to USMS (Pris E-Filing)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.