U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01622
  • Case Name: Elmer v. Renaissance Companies Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.