U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00517
  • Case Name: Law Offices of Pedro A Simpson PLLC v. Fields et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Vacate Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Deposit Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report - Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Application for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.