U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00568
  • Case Name: Mancilla v. Ultimate Fitness Group LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 07, 2025: [Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.