U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08014
  • Case Name: Sun State Towers LLC v. Mohave, County of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ]
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Report - Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.