U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00860
  • Case Name: Arizona, State of v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 14, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 14, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.