U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00450
  • Case Name: Lieberman et al v. Target Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.