U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02910
  • Case Name: Stern v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate/Vacate Motion Hearing ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.