U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Romancho v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 27, 2025: [Civil Case Opening - Fees]
  • March 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 26, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Request for E-Notices]
  • March 18, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 14, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.