U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spurlock et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.