U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mayoral
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • March 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Arrest]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment - For Public]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.