U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fisher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2025: [PSIReferred]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.