U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodgers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.