U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguila
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Petition for Summons for Person Under Supervision - 12C]
  • March 18, 2025: [Petition for Summons for Person Under Supervision - 12C]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.