U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00011-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Greydanus et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Arrest]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order of Release]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Arrest]
  • March 17, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.